Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Plaintiff: Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Case Number: 2:2019cv00933
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 Letter to Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. re: explanation why Plaintiff and Defendant have each submitted their own Case Management Plans by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (Rudman, Samuel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff (Rudman, Samuel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 12 Letter to Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. enclosing Defendant's proposed Case Managment Statement by United States Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mahoney, Kathleen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Anne Mahoney on behalf of United States Securities and Exchange Commission (aty to be noticed) (Mahoney, Kathleen)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., in Courtroom 2E North located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attached blank document.) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 4/10/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., on 3/22/2019. (Several, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Lipari, Vincent)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Judge Joseph F. Bianco, Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Florio, Lisa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. United States Securities and Exchange Commission served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Capeci, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Attorney General Letitia James & United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York, Richard P. Donoghue on February 19, 2019, filed by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. (Capeci, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (Capeci, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against United States Securities and Exchange Commission filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11206203 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Capeci, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kathleen Anne Mahoney
Represented By: Vincent Lipari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
Represented By: Michael G. Capeci
Represented By: Evan Jay Kaufman
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?