Cruz et al v. Collecto, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert R. Rankel and Rosemary Cruz
Defendant: Collecto, Inc. d/b/a EOS CCA and Collecto, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00937
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosemary Cruz, Robert R. Rankel. Collecto, Inc. served on 4/2/2019, answer due 4/23/2019. (Barshay, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Rosemary Cruz, Robert R. Rankel (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - An Initial Conference has been scheduled for 6/13/2019; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/20/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Collecto, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Collecto, Inc. filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11206750, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Rosemary Cruz, Robert R. Rankel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc. d/b/a EOS CCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collecto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Rankel
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: David M. Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Cruz
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: David M. Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?