Redd v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Plaintiff: Fedie R. Redd
Defendant: Sweeny, Gallo, Reich, & Bolz LLP, David Gallo, and Associates, "ETAL", Bryan Cave LLP, Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association, Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency and Berkman,Henoch,Peterson,Peddy & Fenchel PC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01045
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Pamela K Chen
2 Judge: Robert M Levy
3 Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 45 Letter MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by David Gallo, and Associates. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 44 Letter dated April 16, 2019 addressed to Judge Chen from Fedie R. Redd. "Plaintiff respectfully request that the Court deny any request to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 12(b)(l), (2), (5), and (6), or in the alternative the granting of Defendant Summary Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(a). 2." (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Love, Alexis)
April 11, 2019 Filing 43 Letter MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment [32-33] by Berkman,Henoch,Peterson,Peddy & Fenchel PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service on Pro-se Plaintiff) (Evers, Daniel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel James Evers on behalf of Berkman,Henoch,Peterson,Peddy & Fenchel PC (aty to be noticed) (Evers, Daniel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Berkman,Henoch,Peterson,Peddy & Fenchel PC (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph)
April 9, 2019 Filing 40 Letter dated April 9, 2019 addressed to Judge Chen from Fedie R. Redd. "I write to oppose Defendant Daavid A. Gallo's frivolous attempt to confuse and bring fraud upon the Court with his misleading documentation." (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Love, Alexis)
April 9, 2019 Filing 39 Letter dated April 9, 2019 addressed to Judge Chen from Fedie R. Redd. "I write to oppose any pre-motion conference with respect to Defendant's intention to file a pre-answer motion to dismiss the Complaint." (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Love, Alexis)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Having received #38 Plaintiff's letter, the Court apologizes to Plaintiff for failing to timely send all orders to her via mail in light of Plaintiff's pro se status. The Court will send copies of all of its orders entered from April 1, 2019 onward to the address Plaintiff has provided. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/9/2019. (Nadig, Alok) Modified on 4/12/2019 update typographical error. (Abdallah, Fida)
April 9, 2019 Filing 38 Letter addressed to Judge Chen dated April 9, 2019 from Fedie R. Redd requesting "to receive any orders placed on the docket sheet in a timely manner." (Love, Alexis)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against Defendant Sweeney, Reich & Bolz LLP, as Defendant Sweeney, Reich & Bolz LLP has appeared in the case and timely moved to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/5/2019. (Nadig, Alok)
April 4, 2019 Filing 37 Letter Letter in Opposition to Motion for Default by Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Skoczen, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against Defendant David A. Gallo & Associates LLP, as Defendant David A. Gallo & Associates LLP has appeared in the case and timely moved to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/4/2019. (Nadig, Alok)
April 3, 2019 Filing 36 Letter Letter Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Defualt Judgment by David Gallo, and Associates (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NYS Department of State Division of Corportation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - NYS Department of State Division of Coporations, #3 Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service and Legal Back) (Cohen, Jonathan)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Several Defendants in this matter are seeking permission to move for dismissal [25, 26, 29]. Plaintiff has opposed those requests #31 . The Court will treat the premotion conference letters that have been filed [25, 26, 29] as motions to dismiss and Plaintiff's opposition #31 as her initial response. The parties may file additional briefing on Defendants' motions to dismiss as follows: (1) Defendants may file supplemental briefing, in letter form, not to exceed five (5) pages, by April 22, 2019; (2) Plaintiff may file her omnibus opposition, in letter form, not to exceed ten (10) pages, by May 13, 2019; and (3) Defendants may file replies, in letter form, not to exceed three (3) pages, by May 28, 2019. Lastly, this briefing schedule applies to any motions to dismiss being contemplated by any other Defendant, even if that Defendant has not yet filed a premotion conference request, which those Defendants are excused from filing should they decide to move pursuant to the above-delineated expedited briefing schedule. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 4/1/2019. (Nadig, Alok)
March 29, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion for Default Judgment as to Sweeney, Reich & Bolz LLP/AKA/ Sweeney, Gallo, Reich & Bolz LLP by Fedie R. Redd. (Love, Alexis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 34 Request for Certificate of Default as to Sweeney, Reich & Bolz LLP/AKA/ Sweeney, Gallo, Reich & Bolz LLP by Fedie R. Redd. (Love, Alexis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion for Default Judgement as to Berkman, Henoch, Peterson, Peddy & Fenchel P.C. filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Love, Alexis)
March 29, 2019 Filing 32 Request for Certificate of Default as to Berkman, Henoch, Peterson, Peddy & Fenchel P.C. by Fedie R. Redd. (Love, Alexis)
March 27, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for pre motion conference, #25 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Barrett, C)
March 27, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Aghassi on behalf of Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP (aty to be noticed) (Aghassi, Rachel)
March 26, 2019 Filing 29 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP. (Skoczen, Christopher) Modified on 4/10/2019 to update ECF filing event to MOTION to Dismiss, see Judge Chen's 4/1/2019 Order (Barrett, C).
March 26, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher David Skoczen on behalf of Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP (notification declined or already on case) (Skoczen, Christopher)
March 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher David Skoczen on behalf of Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP (aty to be noticed) (Skoczen, Christopher)
March 20, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for pre motion conference Letter Request for Pre-Motion Conference seeking leave to file a Motion to Dismiss by David Gallo, and Associates. (Cohen, Jonathan) Modified on 4/10/2019 to update ECF filing event to MOTION to Dismiss, see Judge Chen's 4/1/2019 Order (Barrett, C).
March 18, 2019 Filing 25 Letter MOTION for a Pre Motion Conference re Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bank of America, N.A., Bryan Cave LLP, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Blaine, Michael) Modified on 3/19/2019 to correct ECF filing event. (Abdallah, Fida) Modified on 4/10/2019 to update ECF filing event to MOTION to Dismiss, see Judge Chen's 4/1/2019 Order (Barrett, C).
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Florio, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Judge Joseph F. Bianco, Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Copy of docket mailed to pro se plaintiff) (Florio, Lisa)
February 26, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Berkman, Henoch, Peterson, Peddy & Fenchel PC, 100 Garden City Plaza, Garden City, NY by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Bryan Cave, LLP, 1290 Avenue of the Americas, NY, NY by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on David Gallo & Associates, 99 Powerhouse Road, Roslyn Heights, NY by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency (OCC), 400 7th Street, S.W. Washington, DC by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Bank of America Corporation, 16001 Dallas Parkway, Addison, TX by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Bank of America Corporation/Bank of America Corporate Office-Brian Moynihan, CEO,100 N. Tryon Street, Charlotte, NC on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae), 780 Third Avenue, NY, NY by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Federal National Mortgage Association Headquarters, 1100 15th Street, N.W., Washington, DC by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sweeney, Gallo, Reich & Bolz LLP, 9525 Queens Blvd., Suite 1100, Rego Park, NY by certified mail on 2/26/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Sweeney, Reich & Bolz, LLP at 1981 Marcus Avenue, Suite 200 Lake Success, NY by certified mail on 2/25/2019, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Coleman, Laurie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 Letter dtd 2/25/19 from pro se office to pro se RE: this will acknowledge receipt of your civil action (Bollbach, Jean)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bollbach, Jean)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Bollbach, Jean)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Related Case; 16-cv-4919-JFB-SIL (Cox, Dwayne)
February 22, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 27185 (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to David Gallo, and Associates. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bryan Cave LLP. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sweeny, Gallo, Reich, & Bolz LLP. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A.. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association. (Cox, Dwayne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Fedie R. Redd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redd v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweeny, Gallo, Reich, & Bolz LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gallo, and Associates
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "ETAL"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Cave LLP
Represented By: Michael E. Blaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Michael E. Blaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Michael E. Blaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweeney, Reich, & Bolz LLP
Represented By: Rachel Aghassi
Represented By: Christopher David Skoczen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkman,Henoch,Peterson,Peddy & Fenchel PC
Represented By: Daniel James Evers
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fedie R. Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?