Teknor Apex Company v. Ray Padula Holdings

Plaintiff: Teknor Apex Company
Defendant: Ray Padula Holdings
Case Number: 2:2019cv02248
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Scott Corsello on behalf of Ray Padula Holdings (aty to be noticed) (Corsello, Bradley)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re #15 First MOTION for Hearing for entry of Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Teknor Apex Company: The parties' proposed case management plan and scheduling order, as set forth in Docket Entry #15 , is hereby adopted as the Scheduling Order in this action. An in-person status conference will be held before this Court on February 12, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip, New York. All counsel shall appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/6/2019. (Minerva, Deanna)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #15 Motion for entry of scheduling order. A telephone status conference will be held on 2/12/2019 at 4:00 PM with Judge Azrack. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to initiate the call and contact Chambers at 631-712-5600 when both parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/6/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Doyle on behalf of Ray Padula Holdings (aty to be noticed) (Doyle, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Hearing for entry of Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by Teknor Apex Company. (Difilippi, Anthony)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (Tel). Counsel For Plaintiff: Michael Aschen. Counsel For Defendants: John Zaccaria. Status Conference held on 6/5/2019 at 3:30 PM. The parties shall submit a proposed discovery schedule to Judge Shields for approval. The case is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Shields to oversee discovery. (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Michael Aschen, Anthony Difilippi. Counsel For Defendants: John Zaccaria. Initial Conference Hearing held on 5/29/2019 at 12:00 PM. A telephone status conference is scheduled for 6/5/2019 at 3:30 PM before Judge Azrack. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call and contact Chambers at 631-712-5600 when both parties are on the line. (FTR Log #12:32-12:53.) (Ortiz, Grisel)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 5/29/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/13/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Federbush on behalf of Ray Padula Holdings (aty to be noticed) (Federbush, Alan)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ray Padula Holdings. (Zaccaria, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ray Padula Holdings (Zaccaria, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Zaccaria on behalf of Ray Padula Holdings (aty to be noticed) (Zaccaria, John)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ray Padula Holdings. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1) (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1) (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Teknor Apex Company (Difilippi, Anthony)
April 18, 2019 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Proposed summons is rejected; the section that reads "The answer or motion must be served on Plaintiff or Plaintiff's attorney, whose name and address are:" has not been completed; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 4/18/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT 1 to Complaint by Teknor Apex Company. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Teknor Apex Company. (Difilippi, Anthony)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ray Padula Holdings filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11394817 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Teknor Apex Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Difilippi, Anthony) Modified on 4/18/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teknor Apex Company v. Ray Padula Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Padula Holdings
Represented By: Alan Federbush
Represented By: Bradley Scott Corsello
Represented By: John Zaccaria
Represented By: Brian Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teknor Apex Company
Represented By: Anthony James Difilippi
Represented By: Michael Aschen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?