United States of America v. Holland
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: J. Ronald Holland and James R. Holland
Case Number: 2:2019cv02456
Filed: April 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by J. Ronald Holland. (Bollbach, Jean)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, (Sarnell, Bradley)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant J. Ronald Holland's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended an additional thirty (30) days. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff, and to file proof of service on the docket sheet, by June 14, 2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/11/2019. (Minerva, Deanna)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by J. Ronald Holland. (Florio, Lisa)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to J. Ronald Holland. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J. Ronald Holland Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Defendant J. Ronald Holland) (Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ronald Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?