Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 3 Lanza LLC et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit One Music, The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. and Conducive Music
Defendant: 3 Lanza LLC, Joseph Lanza, Richard Lanza and Steven Lanza
Case Number: 2:2019cv02637
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Conducive Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. Steven Lanza served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Sidoti, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Conducive Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. Joseph Lanza served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Sidoti, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Conducive Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. Richard Lanza served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Sidoti, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Conducive Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. 3 Lanza LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Sidoti, Mark)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Richard Lanza, #2 Summons Joseph Lanza, #3 Summons Steven Lanza) (Rodin, Deanna)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Rodin, Deanna)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathon Brugh Lower on behalf of Broadcast Music, Inc., Conducive Music, Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (aty to be noticed) (Lower, Jonathon)
May 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Conducive Music, Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Spirit Music Group, Inc. for Spirit One Music; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Sidoti, Mark)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3 Lanza LLC, Joseph Lanza, Richard Lanza, Steven Lanza filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11449279 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by The Bernard Edwards Company LLC, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Conducive Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Broadcast Music, Inc., Embassy Music Corporation, Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (3 Lanza LLC), #3 Proposed Summons (Richard Lanza), #4 Proposed Summons (Joseph Lanza), #5 Proposed Summons (Steven Lanza)) (Sidoti, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 3 Lanza LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Embassy Music Corporation
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spirit One Music
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bernard Edwards Company LLC
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conducive Music
Represented By: Mark S. Sidoti
Represented By: Jonathon Brugh Lower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Lanza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?