Smith v. Davaco, LP
Plaintiff: Cary Smith
Defendant: Davaco, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv02717
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Sandra J Feuerstein
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Davaco, LP (Bersohn, Rina)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Davaco, LP. (Bersohn, Rina)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The Initial Conference is converted to a Telephone Conference and adjourned to 7/17/2019 at 11:30 AM. Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call and contact the Court at (631) 712-5630 with all parties on the line. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 6/26/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference Initial Conference by Cary Smith. (Abelove, Jason)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Davaco, LP; granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Davaco, LP. Application granted. Defendant shall answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before 06/28/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/3/2019. c/ecf (Gilpin, Daniel)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Davaco, LP. (Bersohn, Rina)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Davaco, LP. (Bersohn, Rina)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Storch on behalf of Davaco, LP (aty to be noticed) (Storch, Ellen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rina Bersohn on behalf of Davaco, LP (aty to be noticed) (Bersohn, Rina)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled to be held before the undersigned on 9/9/2019 is advanced to 7/2/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 5/22/2019. c/ECF (Adell, April)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cary Smith. Davaco, LP served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Abelove, Jason)
May 10, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Cary Smith (Abelove, Jason)
May 9, 2019 A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davaco, LP filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11461142, filed by Cary Smith. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Abelove, Jason) Modified on 5/9/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Davaco, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davaco, LP
Represented By: Rina Bersohn
Represented By: Ellen Storch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Smith
Represented By: Jason L. Abelove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?