Kupfer, et al v. Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Kupfer, Charles Kupfer and Betty Kupfer
Defendant: Colonial Fund 17 LLC, Natalie Owens, Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, Denise Singh Skeete Esq., Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC, Jack Getzelman, Colonial Impact Fund II LLC, RMS Asset Management LLC, Cynthia Wallace, SN Servicing Corporation, David Sklar, Servis One Inc., James Guerin, RMS Residential Properties LLC, Mark Antos Esq., Jeffrey A. Kosterich Esq., Colonial Capital Management LLC, Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates PC, John / Jane Doe Defendants 1 - 20, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Residential Properties LLC and Residential Mortgage Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02738
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bianco
Referring Judge: Margo K Brodie
2 Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court's records reflect that the Complaint in this action was filed on May 9, 2019. Accordingly, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service must be made upon any Defendants who have not yet been served by August 7, 2019. Plaintiffs are also required to advise the Clerk of Court of any change of address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/25/2019. (c/m) (Minerva, Deanna)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re #14 Declaration confirming service by Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC, RMS Asset Management LLC, RMS Residential Properties LLC, Residential Mortgage Solution LLC (Brener, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #10 Request for Certificate of Default by Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC, RMS Asset Management LLC, RMS Residential Properties LLC, Residential Mortgage Solution LLC (Brener, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 Request for Certificate of Default by Betty Ann Kupfer, Charles Kupfer as to Defendants Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, ResidentialProperties LLC; RMS Residential Properties LLC, RMS Asset Management LLC,Colonial Capital Management LLC, and Jeffrey A. Kosterich Esq. (Piper, Francine)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. Defendants shall serve their motion on or before July 19, 2019; Plaintiffs shall serve their opposition on or before August 9, 2019; Defendants shall serve their reply, if any, on or before August 23, 2019. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/21/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint by SN Servicing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Briefing Schedule) (Gold, Zachary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Robin Gold on behalf of SN Servicing Corporation (aty to be noticed) (Gold, Zachary)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Re: Proposed Briefing Schedule by Mark Antos Esq., Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates PC (Tracy, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court denies Defendants' request for a pre motion conference and directs Defendants to propose a briefing schedule for their anticipated motion. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/21/2019. (Beeney, Eliza)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint by Mark Antos Esq., Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates PC. (Tracy, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Tracy on behalf of Mark Antos Esq., Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates PC (aty to be noticed) (Tracy, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Request for Certificate of Default by Betty Ann Kupfer, Charles Kupfer (Piper, Francine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betty Ann Kupfer, Charles Kupfer. Colonial Capital Management LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Jeffrey A. Kosterich Esq. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; RMS Asset Management LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; RMS Residential Properties LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Residential Mortgage Solution LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; Residential Properties LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019; SN Servicing Corporation served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Piper, Francine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Betty Ann Kupfer, Charles Kupfer. Mark Antos Esq. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (Piper, Francine)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Brener on behalf of Jack Getzelman, James Guerin, Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC, Jeffrey A. Kosterich Esq., Natalie Owens, RMS Asset Management LLC, RMS Residential Properties LLC, Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, Servis One Inc., Denise Singh Skeete Esq., David Sklar, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Cynthia Wallace (aty to be noticed) (Brener, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Charles Kupfer dated May 23, 2019 enclosing a copy for filing of additional signature pages to be included as part of the complaint. (Cubano, Jazmin)
May 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie. Judge Joseph F. Bianco no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 9, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653139823 (Cox, Dwayne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Cox, Dwayne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Betty Ann Kupfer, Charles Kupfer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kupfer, et al v. Residential Mortgage Solution LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Ann Kupfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kupfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Kupfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Fund 17 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Owens
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Mortgage Solution LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Singh Skeete Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A Kosterich LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Getzelman
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Impact Fund II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMS Asset Management LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Wallace
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Zachary Robin Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sklar
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servis One Inc.
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Guerin
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMS Residential Properties LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Antos Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey A. Kosterich Esq.
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates PC
Represented By: Matthew Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John / Jane Doe Defendants 1 - 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Brener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Mortgage Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?