Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company v. T2 Asset Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: T2 Asset Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02776
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/24/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/26/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by T2 Asset Group, LLC (Cohen, Adam)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company by T2 Asset Group, LLC. (Cohen, Adam)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexa J. Nasta Schmid Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11597855. by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Palefski, Jacob)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended, nunc pro tunc, to and including 6/24/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/18/2019. (Georgescu, Dora)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by T2 Asset Group, LLC. (Cohen, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11497653. by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Palefski, Jacob)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 6/17/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/10/2019. (Georgescu, Dora)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by T2 Asset Group, LLC. (Cohen, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Steven Cohen on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Adam)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis T. D'Antonio on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (D'Antonio, Dennis)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER deferring ruling on DE #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court notes that the pending motion for leave to appear pro hac vice is deficient in that it fails to comply with Local Rule 1.3(C). Specifically, the application fails to include a certificate of good standing. Accordingly, the attorney is granted leave to amend his motion on or before 6/17/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 6/6/2019. (Georgescu, Dora)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION of Service by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Palefski, Jacob)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically approved by Michael J. Kramer, Divisional Office Manager, on 5/29/2019.
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11497653. by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Affidavit of Service) (Kull, Gary)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Palefski, Jacob)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to T2 Asset Group, LLC. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Palefski, Jacob)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
May 10, 2019 FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11469720 (Rodin, Deanna)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rodin, Deanna) Modified on 5/13/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company v. T2 Asset Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T2 Asset Group, LLC
Represented By: Adam Steven Cohen
Represented By: Dennis T. D'Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jacob Jonathan Palefski
Represented By: Gary Scott Kull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?