Casciola et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al

Plaintiff: John Casciola and Stephen R. Casciola
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency and Pete Gaynor
Case Number: 2:2019cv02854
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Docket entry 4 was deleted and re-entered in order to choose the correct event "summons issued as to USA." (Rodin, Deanna)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, Pete Gaynor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
May 17, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11492920 (Janusas, John)
May 14, 2019 The case of Casciola et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al, has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 19cv2854. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Emergency Management Agency, Pete Gaynor Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Stephen Casciola, John Casciola. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Attachment 5 replaced on 5/14/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casciola et al v. Federal Emergency Management Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Casciola
Represented By: John V. Janusas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen R. Casciola
Represented By: John V. Janusas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Emergency Management Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Gaynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?