Selembo v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Selembo
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv02902
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace Scott Appleton on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (aty to be noticed) (Appleton, Candace)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anthony Selembo. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Zeltmann, Francesca)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically approved by Michael J. Kramer, Divisional Office Manager, on 05/29/2019.
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall serve upon plaintiff the administrative record of the proceedings, which shall constitute its answer, or otherwise move against the complaint within 90 days of May 16, 2019, the date plaintiff filed this action. Plaintiff shall move for judgment on the pleadings by service of motion papers upon defendant within 60 days of service of the administrative record. Defendant's response papers shall be served upon plaintiff within 60 days thereafter. Within 21 days of service of defendant's response (that is, by January 6, 2020), plaintiff shall serve his reply on defendant. The parties will then file the entire set of motion papers in the order served, and file the parties' stipulations of fact and the administrative record with the court. The court respectfully reminds the parties that pursuant to chambers practice concerning stipulations of fact for social security motions, see Individual Chambers Practices Section IV(C)(5), https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/rules/KAM-MLR.pdf, the parties shall confer and prepare a stipulation of facts with a chronology of medical treatment, to be filed on ECF on the date that the fully-briefed motions are due. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/21/2019. (Mazzurco, Vincent)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto for all further proceedings. Judge Joanna Seybert no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 5/20/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Michael Anthony Selembo. (Zeltmann, Francesca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11485343 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Michael Anthony Selembo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zeltmann, Francesca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selembo v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Selembo
Represented By: Francesca Zeltmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Represented By: Candace Scott Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?