Iantosca v. Aritzia Inc.

Plaintiff: Mark Iantosca
Defendant: Aritzia Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02925
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Ann M Donnelly
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The motion to adjourn #9 is granted. The initial conference scheduled for 8/16/2019 is hereby adjourned to 8/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/16/2019. (Murphy, Colleen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Aritzia Inc.. (Margiotta, John)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:30 P.M. on 8/16/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/16/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/12/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
June 11, 2019 Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aritzia Inc.. (Margiotta, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aritzia Inc. (Margiotta, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aritzia Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. C/M to Register of Copyrights. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aritzia Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11488471 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Mark Iantosca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iantosca v. Aritzia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Iantosca
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aritzia Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Goldstein
Represented By: John P Margiotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?