Dynamite Marketing, Inc. v. The WowLine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dynamite Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Adam J. Krosser, Sherman Specialty, Inc., The WowLine, Inc., Sherman Specialty LLC, Nancy J. Krosser, Unknown Entities 1-10, www.usimprints.com, www.4allpromos.com, www.superiorpromos.com, Various John Does 1-10, Sherman Specialty Inc and Unknown Websites 1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv03067
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Adam J. Krosser, Nancy J. Krosser, Sherman Specialty Inc, Sherman Specialty LLC, The WowLine, Inc. time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED through 8/30/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/12/2019. (Mucciaccio, Dina) Modified on 7/16/2019 (Torres, Jasmine).
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Sean Kast on behalf of Adam J. Krosser, Nancy J. Krosser, Sherman Specialty Inc, Sherman Specialty LLC, The WowLine, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Kast, Kenneth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by Adam J. Krosser, Nancy J. Krosser, Sherman Specialty Inc, Sherman Specialty LLC, The WowLine, Inc.. (Cooper, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Cooper on behalf of Adam J. Krosser, Nancy J. Krosser, Sherman Specialty Inc, Sherman Specialty LLC, The WowLine, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cooper, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Adam J. Krosser, Nancy J. Krosser, Sherman Specialty Inc, Sherman Specialty LLC, The WowLine, Inc., Unknown Entities 1-10, Unknown Websites 1-10, Various John Does 1-10, www.4allpromos.com, www.usimprints.com. (Ortiz, Grisel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons on www.usimprints.com) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider To Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Rider to Summons) (Orel, Sergei)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendants were missing from the case; added defendants; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against all defendants. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 24, 2019 Proposed summonses are rejected; the caption on the summonses do not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Dynamite Marketing, Inc. (Orel, Sergei)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11508117 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Dynamite Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Design Patent D751877, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Trademark Registration or WALLET NINJA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons The WowLine Summons, #7 Proposed Summons Nancy J. Krosser Summons, #8 Proposed Summons Adam J. Krosser Summons, #9 Proposed Summons Sherman Specialty Inc Summons, #10 Proposed Summons Sherman Specialty LLC Summons) (Orel, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamite Marketing, Inc. v. The WowLine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J. Krosser
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Specialty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The WowLine, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Specialty LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy J. Krosser
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.usimprints.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.4allpromos.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www.superiorpromos.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Specialty Inc
Represented By: Andrew P. Cooper
Represented By: Kenneth Sean Kast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Websites 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamite Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Sergei Orel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?