Interactive Wearables, LLC v. Polar Electro Oy et. al.
Plaintiff: Interactive Wearables, LLC
Defendant: Polar Electro Inc. and Polar Electro Oy
Case Number: 2:2019cv03084
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. The time for defendant Polar Electro Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/17/2019. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, from July 17, 2019 to October 7, 2019 by Polar Electro Inc.. (Yecies, Eric)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Interactive Wearables, LLC. Polar Electro Oy waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Wizenfeld, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The time for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to 7/17/19. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/19/2019. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, from June 19 to July 17, 2019, by Polar Electro Inc.. (Yecies, Eric)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Interactive Wearables, LLC. Polar Electro Inc. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Wizenfeld, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Polar Electro Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 24, 2019 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Polar Electro Inc., Polar Electro Oy filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11510410 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Interactive Wearables, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (Wizenfeld, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Interactive Wearables, LLC v. Polar Electro Oy et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Electro Inc.
Represented By: Eric Harold Yecies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polar Electro Oy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interactive Wearables, LLC
Represented By: Charles Wizenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?