Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach UFSD et al
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran and Christian Killoran
Defendant: Suzanne M. Mensch, James N. Hulme, Halsey C. Stevens, George R. Kast, Westhampton Beach UFSD, Joyce L. Donneson and Michael Radday
Case Number: 2:2019cv03298
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
2 Judge: Steven I Locke
3 Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to J. Seybert re Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Joyce L. Donneson, James N. Hulme, George R. Kast, Suzanne M. Mensch, Michael Radday, Halsey C. Stevens, Westhampton Beach UFSD (Leahey, Anne)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Affidavit of Service) (Leahey, Anne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christian Killoran, Terrie Killoran. Joyce L. Donneson served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; James N. Hulme served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; George R. Kast served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Suzanne M. Mensch served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Michael Radday served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Halsey C. Stevens served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019; Westhampton Beach UFSD served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Valle, Christine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dtd 6/10/19 from pro se office to pro se RE: this acknowledges receipt of your civil action (Bollbach, Jean)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke for all further proceedings. Judge Joan M. Azrack, Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/9/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn L Dar Conte on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dar Conte, Jaclyn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne C. Leahey on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leahey, Anne)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Related Case; 18-cv-3389-JS-SIL (Cox, Dwayne)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Affirmation and Memoranda of Law in Support re: #1 Complaint filed by Christian Killoran, Terrie Killoran. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 5, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 27835 (Cox, Dwayne)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Cox, Dwayne) Modified to correct the date of filing on 6/6/2019 (Cox, Dwayne).
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Christian Killoran, Terrie Killoran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killoran et al v. Westhampton Beach UFSD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne M. Mensch
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James N. Hulme
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halsey C. Stevens
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George R. Kast
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach UFSD
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce L. Donneson
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Radday
Represented By: Jaclyn L Dar Conte
Represented By: Anne C. Leahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrie Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Killoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?