Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03308
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Jami Amarsinghe. Counsel For Defendant: Sanford Jacobs. Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/24/2019 at 3:00 PM. Parties to submit a discovery schedule to Judge Brown for approval within 2 weeks. The case is respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Brown to supervise discovery and handle any disputes. (FTR Log #3:08-11.) (Ortiz, Grisel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Notice of Appearance - SGJ served on Plaintiff Counsel on July 23, 2019, filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Jacobs, Sanford)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanford Gregg Jacobs on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Jacobs, Sanford)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 7/24/2019 at 3:00 PM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/26/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Appearance served on Plaintiff on June 19, 2019, filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Hodges, Kelly)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Ann Hodges on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hodges, Kelly)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer served on Plaintiff on June 19, 2019, filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Hodges, George)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Hodges, George)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on Attorneys for Plaintiff on 6/10/19, filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Hodges, George)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Hodges, George)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna).
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet.. by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Hodges, George) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/5/2019) (Bowens, Priscilla).
June 4, 2019 NOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal served on Jami C. Amarasinghe, Esq. on June 4, 2019, filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Hodges, George)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 603972/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11541458) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hodges, George) Modified on 6/5/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: George S. Hodges
Represented By: Sanford Gregg Jacobs
Represented By: Kelly Ann Hodges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jami Chandima Amarasinghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?