Teitelbaum et. al. v. Tonsa Automotive Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eggant and Alex Teitelbaum
Defendant: Tonsa Automotive Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03392
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for September 26, 2019 at 11 a.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 8/5/2019. (Degennaro, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Letter by Alex Teitelbaum (Napoli, Marie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Letter requesting pre-motion conference and leave to file a motion to dismiss by Tonsa Automotive Inc. (Lipari, Phill)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by June 28, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 6/14/2019. (Cento, Patrick)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Tonsa Automotive Inc.. (Lipari, Phill)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Geoffrey Isaac on behalf of Tonsa Automotive Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Isaac, Ethan)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Phill J. Lipari on behalf of Tonsa Automotive Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Lipari, Phill)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tonsa Automotive Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lipari, Phill)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tonsa Automotive Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 606380/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11554183). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lipari, Phill) Modified on 6/10/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teitelbaum et. al. v. Tonsa Automotive Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonsa Automotive Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Isaac
Represented By: Phill J. Lipari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Eggant
Represented By: Marie E. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Teitelbaum
Represented By: Marie E. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?