D.S. et. al. v. Rockville Centre Union Free School District
Plaintiff: D.S., individually and on behalf of T.S., J.S., individually and on behalf of T.S., J.S. and D.S.
Defendant: Rockville Centre Union Free School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv03430
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Joan M. Azrack no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. So Ordered by District Judge Joan M. Azracl on 7/16/2019. (Ortiz, Grisel)
July 16, 2019 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. (Ortiz, Grisel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by D.S., J.S.. (Decrescenzo, Gina)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Gibson, Susan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M. Gibson on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Gibson, Susan)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by D.S., J.S.. Rockville Centre Union Free School District served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Decrescenzo, Gina)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rockville Centre Union Free School District. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by D.S. and J.S.. (Decrescenzo, Gina) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by D.S. and J.S.. (Decrescenzo, Gina) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 11, 2019 Notice: Re: Missing Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rockville Centre Union Free School District filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11561513 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by D.S. and J.S., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Decrescenzo, Gina) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.S. et. al. v. Rockville Centre Union Free School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockville Centre Union Free School District
Represented By: Susan M. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.S., individually and on behalf of T.S.
Represented By: Gina Decrescenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S., individually and on behalf of T.S.
Represented By: Gina Decrescenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.S.
Represented By: Gina Decrescenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.S.
Represented By: Gina Decrescenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?