Lexidine, LLC v. Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lexidine, LLC
Defendant: Movin' On Sounds and Security Inc. and Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03444
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: James Orenstein
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 Stipulation -- The stipulation is so ordered; the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 29, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/26/2019. (Roantree, Bronwyn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #7 Summons Returned Executed To Extend Time To File Responsive Pleading by Lexidine, LLC (Abbey, Maureen)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lexidine, LLC. Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc. served on 7/6/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Abbey, Maureen)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexidine, LLC (Abbey, Maureen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc.. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 13, 2019 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 13, 2019 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted Defendant Movin' On Sounds and Security Inc. and added Defendant Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc. to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and Exhibits) and re-entered as against Defendant. (Flanagan, Doreen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 6/13/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Movin' On Sounds and Security Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11563775 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Lexidine, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Abbey, Maureen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexidine, LLC v. Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexidine, LLC
Represented By: Maureen Victoria Abbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movin' On Sounds and Security Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movin' On Sounds and Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?