Schirripa v. Gregor Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fred Schirripa
Defendant: Robert Gregor and Gregor Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03520
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roanne L Mann
Referring Judge: Allyne R Ross
2 Judge: Steven Tiscione
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part and denying in part, on consent #10 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The August 12th initial conference is adjourned to the Court's next available time slot, September 10, 2019 at 3:00 p.m.. The parties are directed to commence discovery in the interim. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/7/2019. (Kelson, Lise)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled on August 12, 2019 by Robert Gregor, Gregor Industries, Inc.. (Green, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference is set for 8/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13C South before Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. SEE ATTACHED ORDER AND MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE. ****NOTE: bring the number of copies for distribution of the completed initial conference questionnaire to the conference that you will need. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/5/2019. (Proujansky, Josh)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Gregor, Gregor Industries, Inc.. (Green, Scott)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Schirripa. Robert Gregor served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Spasojevich, Lawrence)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fred Schirripa. Gregor Industries, Inc. served on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Spasojevich, Lawrence)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/15/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
July 14, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to August 5, 2019 to Answer for All Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/14/2019. (Vasquez, Lea)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Robert Gregor, Gregor Industries, Inc.. (Green, Scott)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert Gregor, Gregor Industries, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Gregor, Gregor Industries, Inc filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11576137 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Fred Schirripa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Spasojevich, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schirripa v. Gregor Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gregor
Represented By: Scott R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregor Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Schirripa
Represented By: Lawrence Lee Spasojevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?