Mays v. Bohemian Citizens' Benevolent Society of Astoria Scholarship Fund, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Mays
Defendant: dba BEER GARDEN AT BOHEMIAN HALL, BOHEMIAN CITIZENS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF ASTORIA SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INC., School Safety Jane Doe, Bohemian Citizens' Benevolent Society of Astoria Scholarship Fund, Inc. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv03536
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Referring Judge: Ramon E Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick K. Brewington on behalf of Curtis Mays (aty to be noticed) (Brewington, Frederick)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Joanna Seybert, Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/21/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bohemian Citizens' Benevolent Society of Astoria Scholarship Fund, Inc., Jane Doe. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bohemian Citizens' Benevolent Society of Astoria Scholarship Fund, Inc., Jane Doe, filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11578315, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Curtis Mays. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Proano, Julissa) Modified on 6/18/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. Bohemian Citizens' Benevolent Society of Astoria Scholarship Fund, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dba BEER GARDEN AT BOHEMIAN HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOHEMIAN CITIZENS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY OF ASTORIA SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Safety Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohemian Citizens' Benevolent Society of Astoria Scholarship Fund, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Mays
Represented By: Julissa M. Proano
Represented By: Frederick K. Brewington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?