Carman v. Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joey Carman
Defendant: Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03586
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference scheduled for August 15, 2019 is adjourned to September 24, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 830, Alfonse M. D'Amato U.S. Courthouse, Central Islip, New York. All counsel shall appear. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/12/2019. (Minerva, Deanna)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Joey Carman. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See Order and Attachment. SoOrdered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules) (Torres, Jasmine)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc.. (Hulme, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the Filing regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Landow, Concetta)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc.. (Landow, Concetta)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
June 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
June 20, 2019 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11588037 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Joey Carman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Copyright Form) (Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carman v. Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westhampton Beach Performing Arts Center, Inc.
Represented By: James N Hulme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Carman
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?