Ulinski v. Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56 et al
Plaintiff: Paul E. Ulinski
Defendant: Michael Sullivan, V.G.C., Christopher Natale, GC, Michael Stewart and Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56
Case Number: 2:2019cv03627
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: LaShann DeArcy Hall
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint by Paul E. Ulinski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint) (Ramesar, Thameera)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to anticipated motion to dismiss filed by Paul E. Ulinski. (Ramesar, Thameera)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Defendants filed a letter motion #8 on July 29, 2019, requesting a pre-motion conference regarding their anticipated motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is directed to file a response, not to exceed three (3) pages, by August 14, 2019. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to serve a copy of this Order on the pro se Plaintiff. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 8/2/2019. (Valentin, Winnethka)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Letter Regarding Plaintiff's Correct Address by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56, Christopher Natale, GC, Michael Stewart, Michael Sullivan, V.G.C. (Edelman, Richard)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for pre motion conference by Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56, Christopher Natale, GC, Michael Stewart, Michael Sullivan, V.G.C.. (Edelman, Richard)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard S. Edelman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Edelman, Richard)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56; Christopher Natale; Michael Sullivan; and Michael Stewart. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 - #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons against Defendants and the United States Marshals Service is directed to serve the summons and Amended Complaint upon the Defendants without prepayment of fees. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/12/2019. (Graham, Emily)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56, Christopher Natale, GC, Michael Stewart, Michael Sullivan, V.G.C., filed by Paul E. Ulinski. (Ramesar, Thameera)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul E. Ulinski. (Ramesar, Thameera)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Pro Se Dept to Paul E. Ulinski acknowledging receipt of civil action. (Florio, Lisa)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul E. Ulinski. (Cox, Dwayne) Modified to correct the date of filing on 6/21/2019 (Cox, Dwayne).
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Paul E. Ulinski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulinski v. Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sullivan, V.G.C.
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Natale, GC
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stewart
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood of Railroad Signalmen, Local 56
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul E. Ulinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?