Marchello Jr. v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Marchello Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv03759
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File administrative record and respectfully requesting approval of the proposed amended briefing schedule by Commissioner of Social Security. (Modafferi, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Eugene Marchello Jr.. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/12/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt) (Binder, Charles)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Modafferi on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (aty to be noticed) (Modafferi, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Summary of Schedule. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/28/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Comissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Doudalis, Evelyn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
June 27, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11616587 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Anthony Eugene Marchello Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Binder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marchello Jr. v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Marchello Jr.
Represented By: Charles E. Binder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Matthew J. Modafferi
Represented By: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION - GENERIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?