Bhatti v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noshaba Bhatti
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03787
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sanket J Bulsara
Referring Judge: Kiyo A Matsumoto
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 P.M. on 11/01/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 11/01/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 8/12/2019. (Manson, Eddie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noshaba Bhatti. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Marquez, Raymond)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 3, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11631509 (Marquez, Raymond)
July 2, 2019 The case of Bhatti v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. The case number is 19cv3787. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within seven (7) days. Select the event (Civil Case Filing Fee) and pay online. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 2, 2019 Incorrect Document Entry Information. Counsel used incorrect event when docketing the initiating document in entry 1 and the civil cover sheet in entry 2; deleted documents and re-docketed using the correct events. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Noshaba Bhatti (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet, including page 2. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet, the updated form is on the court's website. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Noshaba Bhatti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A-G) (Rodin, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhatti v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noshaba Bhatti
Represented By: Raymond D. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?