Lopez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 and Guillermo Lopez
Case Number: 2:2019cv03795
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven I Locke
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Without opposition, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 9/16/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/15/2019. (Kantor, Jesse)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando Carlos Rivera-Maissonet on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 (aty to be noticed) (Rivera-Maissonet, Fernando)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Guillermo Lopez. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Marquez, Raymond)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3 filing fee $400, receipt number BNYEDC-11621462, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Guillermo Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibits A-H) (Marquez, Raymond) Modified on 7/1/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the pooling and servicing agreement dated as of May 1, 2005 Park Place Securities, Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through certificates series 2005-WHQ3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Lopez
Represented By: Raymond D. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?