DiPierdomenico et. al. v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Andrea DiPierdomenico and John DiPierdomenico
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv04008
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Roanne L Mann
2 Judge: Joanna Seybert
3 Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT B by Andrea DiPierdomenico, John DiPierdomenico. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Andrea DiPierdomenico, John DiPierdomenico. (Frome, Paula)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT A by Andrea DiPierdomenico, John DiPierdomenico. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Andrea DiPierdomenico, John DiPierdomenico. (Frome, Paula)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown for all further proceedings. Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, Chief Magistrate Jud Roanne L. Mann no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/8/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Motion to consolidate cases is denied without prejudice with leave to re-file, if necessary, after reassignment. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 8/8/2019. (Craft, Rachel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Andrea DiPierdomenico, John DiPierdomenico. (Frome, Paula)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Schwartz Frome on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Frome, Paula)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Galeano, Sonia)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Andrea DiPierdomenico, John DiPierdomenico (Druker, James)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet in Case No. 2:19-cv-04008. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Chief Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11653071 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - No,, filed by John DiPierdomenico, Andrea DiPierdomenico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Druker, James) Modified on 7/11/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). Modified on 8/26/2019 to seal Exhibit A & B, as requested by Attorney, and with permission from JS Chambers. (Valle, Christine).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiPierdomenico et. al. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea DiPierdomenico
Represented By: James Druker
Represented By: Paula Schwartz Frome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John DiPierdomenico
Represented By: James Druker
Represented By: Paula Schwartz Frome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?