Roberge et al v. The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Denis Roberge and Lucille Roberge
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04115
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: James Orenstein
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: September 6, 2019. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: September 6, 2019. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: October 11, 2019. Status Conference (with joint status report due two business days in advance): November 14, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Fact discovery to be completed by: December 20, 2019. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due by: January 20, 2020. Defendant's expert disclosures due by: February 20, 2020. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: February 20, 2020. Pretrial Conference (ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): March 4, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: March 18, 2020. Joint pretrial order due by: April 20, 2020. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 8/21/2019. (Orenstein, James)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James Orenstein:Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/21/2019. Scheduling: (1) The next status conference will be held on November 14, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. (2) A pretrial conference will be held on March 4, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Summary: The plaintiff agrees that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000 and has no procedural objection to the removal of the case to this court. I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that reflects, with minor modifications, the deadlines set forth in the parties' joint discovery plan. Mr. Apostolos will promptly file a notice of appearance. (Orenstein, James)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Scheduling Order Initial Conference Questionnaire by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Kelly, Meagan)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(a), I order the parties to appear for an initial discovery planning conference on, August 21, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11D South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. No later than August 19, 2019, the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF (Electronic Case Filing) system, a joint proposed discovery plan. Each party's counsel must be personally prepared to discuss all factual and legal issues in the case, including the possibility of settlement; otherwise, the client must attend in person as well. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 7/25/2019. (Guy, Alicia)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint with Jury Demand by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Kelly, Meagan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/18/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Pollack on behalf of The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pollack, David)
July 17, 2019 This case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 17, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Nathan Giacopelli on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Giacopelli, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Kelly, Meagan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, case number 607954/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11668862) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kelly, Meagan) Modified on 7/17/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberge et al v. The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Roberge
Represented By: Liza Milgrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucille Roberge
Represented By: Liza Milgrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Meagan M. Kelly
Represented By: Michael Nathan Giacopelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Meagan M. Kelly
Represented By: Michael Nathan Giacopelli
Represented By: David M. Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?