First Republic Bank v. Chan et. al.
Plaintiff: First Republic Bank
Defendant: American Express National Bank, Joanna Chan and Calton Chan
Case Number: 2:2019cv04228
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Nicholas G Garaufis
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant American Express National Bank, Calton Chan, Joanna Chan has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant American Express National Bank, Calton Chan, Joanna Chan is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Poveda, J.)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Request for Certificate of Default by First Republic Bank (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter M. Knob in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Certificate of Default) (Knob, Peter)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by First Republic Bank (Knob, Peter)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Republic Bank. Calton Chan served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Knob, Peter)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Republic Bank. Joanna Chan served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (Knob, Peter)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by First Republic Bank. American Express National Bank served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Knob, Peter)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION #2 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 7/24/2019. (Marziliano, August)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Express National Bank, Calton Chan, Joanna Chan. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Joanna Chan, #2 Summons-American Express National Bank) (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically re Filing of Complaint on 7-22-19 by First Republic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 1st $400 Payment, #2 Exhibit B - 2nd $400 Payment) (Knob, Peter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express National Bank, Calton Chan, Joanna Chan filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11687886 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by First Republic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Supplement Certificate of Merit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons for Calton Chan, #10 Proposed Summons for Joanna Chan, #11 Proposed Summons for American Express National Bank) (Knob, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Republic Bank v. Chan et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Peter M Knob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calton Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?