Ball et al v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ball, Francis Durr, Linda Reilly, Bruce Malen, Joanne Foley, Donna Paulsen, Sheldon Gofter, Josef Kotowski, Linda Cherney, William F. Holecek III, Jeanene Dimino, Jacqueline Yilmaz, Maureen McDermott, Amanda Lowe, Alan P. Glueckert and Murray Schiff
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation and Northrop Grumman Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04381
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Application for Pre-Motion Conference by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Kaufman, Jessica)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER terminating #5 : The request for a Pre-Motion Conference was improperly filed as a motion, and has accordingly been terminated. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 9/10/2019. (Bochner, Francesca)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Kaufman, Jessica)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for all Defendants to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including September 9, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/6/2019. (Jacobwitz, Beth)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, (on Consent) by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Kaufman, Jessica)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/2/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson for all further proceedings. Judge Allyne R. Ross, Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/1/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northrop Grumman Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation from Ball, et al. v. Northrop Grumman Corporation, et al., case number 608933/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11713609) Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed?- Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Esposito, Grant) Modified on 7/31/2019 (Doudalis, Evelyn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball et al v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Grant Joseph Esposito
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Grant Joseph Esposito
Represented By: Robert James Baehr
Represented By: Jessica Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ball
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Durr
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Reilly
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Malen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Foley
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Paulsen
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheldon Gofter
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef Kotowski
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Cherney
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Holecek III
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanene Dimino
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Yilmaz
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen McDermott
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lowe
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan P. Glueckert
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Schiff
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Lilia Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?