United States of America v. Sherman
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Alana Sherman and Alana K. Sherman
Case Number: 2:2019cv04649
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Default Judgment to the Clerk for sum certain by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 affidavit, #2 affirmation, #3 exhibit a, #4 clerk's entry of default, #5 complaint, #6 affidavits of service of the complaint, #7 affidavit of service of motion for a default judgment) (Manfredi, John)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Alana Sherman has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Alana Sherman is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Certificate of Default by United States of America (Manfredi, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Alana Sherman served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (Manfredi, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alana Sherman. (Corsini, Alexander)
August 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Corsini, Alexander)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2019: #1 Quality Control Check) (Corsini, Alexander).
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alana Sherman Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 exhibit a, #2 proposed summons, #3 civil cover) (Manfredi, John) Modified on 8/14/2019 (Corsini, Alexander).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alana Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alana K. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?