Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Marcinek
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Defendant: Thomas Marcinek
Case Number: 2:2019cv04681
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frederic Block
Referring Judge: Cheryl L Pollak
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Certificate of Default by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Non-Military Affidavit and Affidavits of Service) (Vargas, Stephen)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Thomas Marcinek served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas Marcinek. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Bebirian, Nicholas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Marcinek filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11759526 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for all Defendants, #3 Certificate of Merit pursuant to CPLR 3012-b) (Bebirian, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freedom Mortgage Corporation v. Marcinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Marcinek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas John Bebirian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?