Loschke v. Incorporated Village of Floral Park
Plaintiff: Tyler Loschke
Defendant: Incorporated Village of Floral Park
Case Number: 2:2019cv04859
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN is hereby adopted. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/7/2019 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
October 7, 2019 Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held on 10/7/2019 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for both sides appeared. The discovery schedule will be posted separately. Fact discovery will end on 2/7/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Letter to Judge Cogan in advance of the October 7, 2019 Conference (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Nardo, Raymond)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Incorporated Village of Floral Park's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, dated September 26, 2019 by Incorporated Village of Floral Park. (Ryan, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyler Loschke. Incorporated Village of Floral Park served on 9/5/2019, answer due 9/26/2019. (Nardo, Raymond)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 10/7/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
August 26, 2019 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (Mahoney, Brenna)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Incorporated Village of Floral Park. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
August 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Doudalis, Evelyn)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Incorporated Village of Floral Park filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11789737 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Tyler Loschke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nardo, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loschke v. Incorporated Village of Floral Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incorporated Village of Floral Park
Represented By: John E. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Loschke
Represented By: Raymond Nardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?