Porteck India Infoservices Private Ltd. v. Orion Healthcorp, Inc.
In Re: MDRX Medical Billing, LLC, Western Skies Practice Management, Inc., Medical Billing Services, Inc., Allegiance Consulting Associates, LLC, New York Network Management, L.L.C., Rand Medical Billing, Inc., Allegiance Billing & Consulting, LLC, Constellation Healthcare Technologies, Inc., Northeast Medical Solutions, LLC, Vachette Business Services, Ltd., Northstar FHA, LLC, RMI Physician Services Corporation, Vega Medical Professionals, LLC, Phoenix Health, LLC, Northstar First Health, LLC, Integrated Physician Solutions, Inc., Physicians Practice Plus Holdings, LLC, NEMS Acquisition, LLC, Physicians Practice Plus, LLC, NEMS West Virginia, LLC and NYNM Acquisition, LLC
Trustee: United States Trustee
Appellant: Porteck India Infoservices Private Ltd.
Appellee: Orion Healthcorp, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05009
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This appeal is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/30/2019. (Terranova, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Porteck India Infoservices Private Ltd. (Rosen, Sanford)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a) provides that an "appellant must file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellee a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented... within 14 days after: (i) the appellant's notice of appeal as of right becomes effective under Rule 8002; or (ii) an order granting leave to appeal is entered." Appellant is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, in writing by October 24, 2019, why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a). See In re MF Glob. Holdings Ltd., No. 17-CV-167, 2017 WL 744603, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Feb. 23, 2017). The briefing schedule set forth in the September 30, 2019 docket entry is hereby stayed until the Court directs otherwise. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/17/2019. (Terranova, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Incomplete Bankruptcy Record Received (No Designations have been filed) 8-18-71748-ast. Notice to all parties, in accordance with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), that the record has been received or is available electronically. Parties shall now follow briefing schedule as set forth in Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018. Specifically, appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days of this notice, the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days after service of the appellants brief, and the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellees brief, but a reply brief must be filed at least 7 days before scheduled argument. (Attachments: #1 Trans of Add Rec on Appeal (BK Notice Recipients) (Florio, Lisa)
September 4, 2019 Notice that appeal from the Bankruptcy Court has been docketed. Parties shall file with the Bankruptcy Clerk their designations of items to be included in the record and statement of issues to be presented pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. USBC Case No. 8-18-71748-ast. (Corsini, Alexander)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 8-18-71748-ast., filed by Porteck India Infoservices Private Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 USBC Transmittal, #2 USBC Docket Sheet, #3 USBC Documents, #4 USBC Notice of Recipients) (Corsini, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porteck India Infoservices Private Ltd. v. Orion Healthcorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: MDRX Medical Billing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Western Skies Practice Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Medical Billing Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Allegiance Consulting Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: New York Network Management, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Rand Medical Billing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Allegiance Billing & Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Constellation Healthcare Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Northeast Medical Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Vachette Business Services, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Northstar FHA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: RMI Physician Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Vega Medical Professionals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Phoenix Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Northstar First Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Integrated Physician Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Physicians Practice Plus Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NEMS Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Physicians Practice Plus, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NEMS West Virginia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: NYNM Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: United States Trustee
Represented By: Stan Yuon Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Porteck India Infoservices Private Ltd.
Represented By: Sanford P. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Orion Healthcorp, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Amato
Represented By: Thomas R. Califano
Represented By: Mark Thomas Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?