Teiner et al v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Teiner and Richard Watts
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05088
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Gary R Brown
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Case closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/7/2019. (Coleman, Laurie)
October 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Teiner, Richard Watts (Pashkin, Mitchell)
October 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Teiner, Richard Watts (Pashkin, Mitchell)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD Received from the Suffolk County Clerk's Office - Enclosing a Certified Copy of Clerk's Minutes for the E-filed Supreme Court case, Index #606992/19, along with a copy of the Notice of Removal or 8019(c) with order. (Tirado, Chelsea)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Beth Silverman on behalf of Midland Credit Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Silverman, Ellen)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Midland Credit Management, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 606992/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11824513) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Corwin, Matthew) Modified on 9/6/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teiner et al v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Teiner
Represented By: Mitchell L. Pashkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Watts
Represented By: Mitchell L. Pashkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B Corwin
Represented By: Ellen Beth Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?