Saccone v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Anthony Saccone
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv05183
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR INITIAL CONFERENCE. Counsel For Plaintiff: Philip Vogt. Counsel For Defendants: Christopher Yodice. Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/31/2019 at 11:30 AM. A telephone status conference is set for 1/15/2020 at 5:15 PM before Judge Azrack. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call and contact Chambers at 631-712-5600 when all parties are on the line. (Ortiz, Grisel)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 10/31/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Joan M. Azrack in Courtroom 920 of the Long Island Courthouse. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 10/22/2019. (Posillico, Lauren)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Long Island Railroad Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Long Island Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway for The Long Island Railroad Company. (Yodice, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Long Island Railroad Company. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Long Island Railroad Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11838012 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Anthony Saccone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Vogt, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saccone v. The Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Saccone
Represented By: Philip Patrick Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Christopher P. Yodice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?