Three Village Central School District v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Three Village Central School District
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05662
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Case transferred from New York Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-07028, filed 10/25/2019. (Florio, Lisa)
October 23, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3). IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. (Florio, Lisa)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO 3). IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick, III. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Ortiz, Grisel)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Juul Labs, Inc. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Three Village Central School District (Gacovino, Steven)
October 8, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The second page of the Civil Cover Sheet is missing. The current 2 page document can be found on the court's website. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Three Village Central School District against Juul Labs, Inc. filing fee $400, receipt number BNYEDC-11920656, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes, filed by Three Village Central School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Proposed Summons) (Gacovino, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Three Village Central School District v. Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three Village Central School District
Represented By: Steven D. Gacovino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?