Mylan API US LLC et al v. American Regent, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mylan API US LLC and Mylan Institutional LLC
Defendant: American Regent, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05675
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Steven M Gold
Referring Judge: Roslynn R Mauskopf
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Adjourn Conference. Defendant American Regent, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by January 13, 2020. The initial conference previously scheduled for December 13, 2019 is adjourned to January 27, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13D South before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/26/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until January 13, 2020 on consent, Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for 12/13/19 on consent by American Regent, Inc.. (Brivanlou, Margaret)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 3:30 p.m. on December 13, 2019 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiffs are directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Chamber's Individual Rules) (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant American Regent, Inc. shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/30/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Respond until November 29, 2019 without opposition by American Regent, Inc.. (Brivanlou, Margaret)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Steuer on behalf of Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Steuer, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Stafford on behalf of Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC (notification declined or already on case) (Stafford, Nicole)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Bolce Brivanlou on behalf of American Regent, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Brivanlou, Margaret)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald J Flattmann on behalf of American Regent, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Flattmann, Gerald)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nicole Stafford shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/22/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David S. Steuer shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $150.00 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 10/22/2019. (Gillespie, Saudia)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11967250. by Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC. (Stafford, Nicole)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11954745. by Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Steuer in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Steuer, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC. American Regent, Inc. served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Fodeman, Morris)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Regent, Inc.. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2019: #2 Complaint) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/9/2019) (Almonte, Giselle).
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 8, 2019 This is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Regent, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11922866 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Institutional LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J) (Fodeman, Morris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mylan API US LLC et al v. American Regent, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Regent, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald J Flattmann
Represented By: Margaret Bolce Brivanlou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mylan API US LLC
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Nicole Stafford
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mylan Institutional LLC
Represented By: Morris J. Fodeman
Represented By: Nicole Stafford
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?