Windward Bora LLC v. Zelaya et al
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau, American Express Centurion Bank, Elsa F Ventura, Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court, People of the State of New York, Jose T Zelaya, Elsa F. Ventura, Elsa E. Ventura and Jose T. Zelaya
Case Number: 2:2019cv05739
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary R Brown
Referring Judge: Denis R Hurley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants American Express Centurion Bank, Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court, People of the State of New York, Elsa F. Ventura, and Jose T. Zelaya have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants American Express Centurion Bank, Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court, People of the State of New York, Elsa F. Ventura, and Jose T. Zelaya are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Certificate of Default by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Jose T. Zelaya served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Elsa F. Ventura served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. American Express Centurion Bank served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. People of the State of New York served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Kobos on behalf of Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau (aty to be noticed) (Kobos, Dana)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Express Centurion Bank, Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau, People of the State of New York, Elsa F. Ventura, Jose T. Zelaya, filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through Exhibit G) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to American Express Centurion Bank, Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau, People of the State of New York, Elsa F. Ventura, Jose T. Zelaya. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Windward Bora LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Express Centurion Bank, Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court, Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau, People of the State of New York, Elsa F Ventura, Jose T Zelaya filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11933719 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" through Exhibit "G", #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windward Bora LLC v. Zelaya et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County Traffic & Violations Bureau
Represented By: Dana Kobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsa F Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of the Suffolk County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose T Zelaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsa F. Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elsa E. Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose T. Zelaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?