United States of America v. Rowe
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Roger Rowe
Case Number: 2:2019cv05770
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William F Kuntz
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated 11/22/2019 to Magistrate Judge Scanlon from Roger Rowe requesting for relief based on Fed Rule 12 (b)(b) for failure to state a claim be granted. See letter for details. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Appearance - Pro se) (Tavarez, Jennifer)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 12/19/2019 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 12/12/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. C/M to pro se Defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/18/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein, Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/4/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Roger Rowe served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Lizama, Thelma)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roger Rowe. (Tirado, Chelsea)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant(s) and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF. (Disbrow, Sandra)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Roger Rowe. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Lizama, Thelma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thelma A Lizama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?