Windward Bora LLC v. Mone et. al.
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA, Michael V. Mone, People of the State of New York and Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv05797
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denis R Hurley
Referring Judge: Anne Y Shields
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Michael V. Mone served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Michael V. Mone. (Grausso, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Sanford Reiss on behalf of Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Reiss, Leonard)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Capital One Bank USA NA served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc. served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windward Bora LLC. People of the State of New York served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Weinreb, Alan)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See Order and Attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 AYS Rules) (Torres, Jasmine)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank USA NA, Michael V. Mone, People of the State of New York, Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc.. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Windward Bora LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinreb, Alan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Certificate of Merit Affirmation Pursuant to CPLR 3012-b by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windward Bora LLC (Weinreb, Alan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank USA NA, Michael V Mone, People of the State of New York, Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11941733 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Windward Bora LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" through Exhibit "F", #2 N.Y. RPAPL 1320 Notice) (Weinreb, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windward Bora LLC v. Mone et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank USA NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Mone
Represented By: William Grausso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosenthal & Rosenthal, Inc.
Represented By: Leonard Sanford Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windward Bora LLC
Represented By: Alan H Weinreb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?