Calixte v. Gillespie et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Calixte, Jr.
Defendant: Elliot J. Blumenthal, Laura Curran, Thomas Meehan, Bill Walsch, Kenneth St. Bernard, Patrick Haughey, Christiana McSloy, Madeline Singas, William J. Kephart, Martha Leventhal, Thomas Biggers, Robert A. Schwartz, William Gillespie, Nassau County, Kenneth M. Cozza, Michael Degarabedian, John R. Longo, Tova B. Simpson, Bradley Molloy, Paul Devore and Teresa K. Corrigan
Case Number: 2:2019cv05898
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 25 OBJECTION to Defendant's Late Answer filed by Pro Se Litigant Joseph L. Calixte, Jr. dated 12/69/2019. (Ortiz, Grisel)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #6 Motion for Pre Motion Conference without prejudice; granting #8 Motion to Stay; denying #9 Motion to Compel without prejudice; denying #10 Motion for Pre Motion Conference without prejudice; denying #13 Motion for Pre Motion Conference without prejudice; denying #15 Motion for Pre Motion Conference without prejudice; deferring ruling on #23 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; denying #24 Motion for Pre Motion Conference without prejudice. This case is stayed pending the disposition of the plaintiff's criminal case. Defendants may refile their pre-motion conference letters after the stay is lifted. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se plaintiff. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/6/2019. (JS)
December 5, 2019 Filing 24 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference re #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, by Teresa K. Corrigan. (Pack, Lori)
December 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement #1 Complaint, by Joseph Calixte, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion to Amend Caption, #3 Proposed Amended Complaint) (Ortiz, Grisel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kenneth St. Bernard dated 11/10/2019. (Ortiz, Grisel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 Letter to Court Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Martha Leventhal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Weinstock, Gregg)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Certificate of Default by Joseph Calixte, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation in Support of Request for Certificate of Default, #2 Proposed Certificate of Default, #3 Exhibit) (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Karolina Maria Wiaderna on behalf of Martha Leventhal (aty to be noticed) (Wiaderna, Karolina)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg D. Weinstock on behalf of Martha Leventhal (aty to be noticed) (Weinstock, Gregg)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Pro Se Litigant to Judge Azrack and Judge Tomlinson dated 11/14/2019 Re: Prohibition against any STAY. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot J. Blumenthal on behalf of Elliot J. Blumenthal (aty to be noticed) (Blumenthal, Elliot)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Pre Motion Conference Amended Calixte letter pre-motion conference by Martha Leventhal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Weinstock, Gregg) Modified event type from Letter to Motion on 11/18/2019 (Ortiz, Grisel).
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 Letter re: pre-motion conference by Martha Leventhal (Weinstock, Gregg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for pre motion conference by Michael Degarabedian. (Barrett, Rebecca)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Patrick Haughey. (Cubano, Jazmin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 Letter MOTION for Pre Motion Conference, by Elliot J. Blumenthal (Blumenthal, Elliot) Modified event type from Letter to Motion on 11/5/2019 (Ortiz, Grisel).
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by William J. Kephart. (Ortiz, Grisel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Letter MOTION to Compel the Court to conduct a hearing as the the "cause of actions" and in objection to the letter from Assistant Attorney General Lori L. Pack, Esq. alleging that Plaintiff's case be dismissed as there is no cause of action as to which relief can be sought by Joseph Calixte, Jr. (Coleman, Laurie)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Stay this lawsuit pending disposition of Plaintiff's criminal case (inclusive of all appeals which may be related thereto) by Thomas Biggers, Kenneth M. Cozza, Laura Curran, Paul Devore, William Gillespie, Christiana McSloy, Thomas Meehan, Bradley Molloy, Nassau County, Tova B. Simpson, Madeline Singas, Bill Walsch. (Ben-Sorek, Liora)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Calixte, Jr. Thomas Biggers served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Elliot J. Blumenthal served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019; Teresa K. Corrigan served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Kenneth M. Cozza served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Laura Curran served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Michael Degarabedian served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Paul Devore served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; William Gillespie served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Patrick Haughey served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; William J. Kephart served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019; Martha Leventhal served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; John R. Longo served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Christiana McSloy served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Thomas Meehan served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Bradley Molloy served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Nassau County served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Robert A. Schwartz served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Tova B. Simpson served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Madeline Singas served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019; Kenneth St. Bernard served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019; Bill Walsch served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Ortiz, Grisel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Complaint, by Teresa K. Corrigan. (Pack, Lori)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER dated 10/21/2019 from Pro Se Department to Joseph Calixte, Jr. re Acknowledgment of receipt of civil action. (Coleman, Laurie)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Related Case: 18-cv-4186-JMA-AKT (Cox, Dwayne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 18, 2019 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 28662 (Cox, Dwayne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Cox, Dwayne)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Joseph Calixte, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #13 Exhibit I) (Cox, Dwayne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calixte v. Gillespie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Calixte, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot J. Blumenthal
Represented By: Elliot J. Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Curran
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Meehan
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Walsch
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth St. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Haughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christiana McSloy
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline Singas
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Kephart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Leventhal
Represented By: Gregg D. Weinstock
Represented By: Karolina Maria Wiaderna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Biggers
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gillespie
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Cozza
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Degarabedian
Represented By: Rebecca A. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Longo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tova B. Simpson
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Molloy
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Devore
Represented By: Liora M. Ben-Sorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa K. Corrigan
Represented By: Lori L. Pack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?