HJB Enterprises, LLC et al v. Eastern Bank et al
Plaintiff: HJB Enterprises, LLC, Benjamin Landa and Howard S. Fensterman
Defendant: Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C. and Eastern Bank
Case Number: 2:2019cv05965
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The November 13, 2019 letter #14 is deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/19/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 Letter to Honorable Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay and Honorable Joanna Seybert by Howard S. Fensterman, HJB Enterprises, LLC, Benjamin Landa (Singer, Keith)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 : The Court's November 18, 2019 Order is amended. The November 20, 2019 conference is adjourned without date. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report upon receipt of a decision regarding the anticipated motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/18/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #8 : The conference scheduled for November 20, 2019 at 2:00 p.m., is converted into a telephone conference. The Court will initiate the conference call. The parties are directed to dial (888) 278-0296 at the scheduled time to access the call center. At the prompt enter access code 9424335. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/18/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilana Volkov on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Volkov, Ilana)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER GRANTING #11 Letter Application filed by HJB Enterprises, LLC, Benjamin Landa, Howard S. Fensterman. Pre-Motion Conference set for Fri. 1/10/2020 at 2:30pm in Courtroom 1030 before Judge Joanna Seybert.Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/14/2019. (Baran, Charles)
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 Letter to Honorable Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay by Howard S. Fensterman, HJB Enterprises, LLC, Benjamin Landa (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Opposition) (Singer, Keith)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger L. Smerage on behalf of Eastern Bank, Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C. (notification declined or already on case) (Smerage, Roger)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Fox on behalf of Eastern Bank, Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C. (notification declined or already on case) (Fox, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER re #7 , #9 : The Motions of Roger L. Smerage and James C. Fox for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/13/2019. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to Honorable Joanna Seybert by Howard S. Fensterman, HJB Enterprises, LLC, Benjamin Landa (Singer, Keith)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pre-Motion Conference. Pre-Motion Conference set for Wed. 12/18/2019 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 1030 before Judge Joanna Seybert. See attached Notice. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 11/12/2019. (Baran, Charles)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James C. Fox Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12053084. by Eastern Bank, Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James C. Fox in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Fox, James)
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Requesting to Conduct Initial Conference Telephonically by Eastern Bank, Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C. (Shah, Pearl) Modified on 11/18/2019 (Imrie, Robert).
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Roger L. Smerage Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12034479. by Eastern Bank, Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Roger L. Smerage in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Smerage, Roger)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Letter regarding pre-motion conference by Howard S. Fensterman, HJB Enterprises, LLC, Benjamin Landa (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint) (Singer, Keith)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Eastern Bank, Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C.. (Shah, Pearl)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Nassau County, case number 613147/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11971732) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavits of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shah, Pearl) Modified on 10/23/2019 (Rodin, Deanna).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HJB Enterprises, LLC et al v. Eastern Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HJB Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Keith J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Landa
Represented By: Keith J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard S. Fensterman
Represented By: Keith J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruberto, Israel & Weiner, P.C.
Represented By: Pearl Shah
Represented By: James C. Fox
Represented By: Roger L. Smerage
Represented By: Ilana Volkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Bank
Represented By: Pearl Shah
Represented By: James C. Fox
Represented By: Roger L. Smerage
Represented By: Ilana Volkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?