Wu v. AT&T Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06178
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Dora Lizette Irizarry
Referring Judge: Peggy Kuo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kathy Wu. AT&T Inc. waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020. (Solotoff, Darryn)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/7/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on February 12, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Order on defendant and file proof of service on the docket. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (Landow, Concetta)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
November 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12001159 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Kathy Wu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Solotoff, Darryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wu v. AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Wu
Represented By: Dana Lauren Gottlieb
Represented By: Darryn G Solotoff
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gottlieb
Represented By: Darryn G. Solotoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?