Eames v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Jefferson Eames
Defendant: Dennis M. Brown, The Incorporated Village of Westhampton Beach, The County Of Suffolk, GM Financial, Jacqueline Caputi, The Incorporated Village of Southampton and The Town of East Hampton
Case Number: 2:2019cv06214
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Steven I Locke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 30 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, from 01/06/20 to 02/20/20 by GM Financial. (Schilling, Andrew)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant GM Financial to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 1/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 12/5/2019. (Georgescu, Dora)
December 4, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GM Financial identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Other Affiliate General Motors Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate General Motors Financial Company, Inc., Other Affiliate General Motors Financial Company, Inc. for GM Financial. (Schilling, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 28 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, from 12/09/19 until 01/06/20 by GM Financial. (Schilling, Andrew)
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Schilling on behalf of GM Financial (aty to be noticed) (Schilling, Andrew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Dennis M. Brown, Jacqueline Caputi (notification declined or already on case) (Macy, Joseph)
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Napolitano on behalf of Dennis M. Brown, Jacqueline Caputi (notification declined or already on case) (Napolitano, Donna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna A. Napolitano on behalf of Dennis M. Brown, Jacqueline Caputi, The County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Napolitano, Donna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E. Macy on behalf of Dennis M. Brown, Jacqueline Caputi, The County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Macy, Joseph)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendant The County of Suffolk to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 1/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/27/2019. (Georgescu, Dora)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Electronic ORDER granting DE #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent, the deadline for Defendants The Incorporated Village of Southampton, The Incorporated Village of Westhampton Beach, and The Town of East Hampton to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 1/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 11/27/2019. (Georgescu, Dora)
November 26, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. GM Financial served on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. The Incorporated Village of Westhampton Beach served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. The Incorporated Village of Southampton served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. The Town of East Hampton served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. The County of Suffolk served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. Jacqueline Caputi served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jefferson Eames. Dennis M. Brown served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The County of Suffolk. (Schirmer, Drew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew W. Schirmer on behalf of The County of Suffolk (aty to be noticed) (Schirmer, Drew)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, from 12/5/2019 until 1/6/2020 by The Incorporated Village of Southampton, The Incorporated Village of Westhampton Beach, The Town of East Hampton. (Gross, Felicia)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Felicia Gross on behalf of The Incorporated Village of Southampton, The Incorporated Village of Westhampton Beach, The Town of East Hampton (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Felicia)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (Landow, Concetta)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were mad. (Landow, Concetta)
November 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Jefferson Eames (Campanelli, Andrew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on behalf of himself and Others similarly situated against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12008238 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Jefferson Eames. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: County Form CA-4, #2 Exhibit B: County Form CA-5, #3 Exhibit C: Letter to TD Auto Finance, #4 Exhibit D: 2/26/16 Letter to Meola, #5 Exhibit E: 11/30/15 Letter to Caputi, #6 Exhibit F: 11/30/15 Letter to Caputi, #7 Exhibit G: 2/18/16 Letter to Caputi, #8 Exhibit H: 2/9/16 Letter to Caputi, #9 Exhibit I: 9/4/15 Letter to Caputi, #10 Exhibit J: 5/10/16 Letter to Caputi, #11 Exhibit K: 9/9/15 Letter to Caputi, #12 Exhibit L: 8/13/15 Letter to Caputi, #13 Exhibit M: 2/16/16 Memo to Police Impound, #14 Exhibit N: 12/13/17 Memo to Police Impound, #15 Exhibit O: 5/26/16 GM Financial Vehicle Invoice, #16 Exhibit P: 11/17/16 East Hampton Notice of Seizure, #17 Exhibit Q: Google Search of Vin no., #18 Exhibit R: 12/23/17 Westhampton Beach Notice of Seizure, #19 Exhibit S: 6/6/16 Southampton Village Notice of Seizure, #20 Civil Cover Sheet Eames_Civil Cover Sheet) (Campanelli, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eames v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Brown
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Incorporated Village of Westhampton Beach
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County Of Suffolk
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Represented By: Drew W. Schirmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Financial
Represented By: Andrew W. Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Caputi
Represented By: Donna A. Napolitano
Represented By: Joseph E. Macy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Incorporated Village of Southampton
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Town of East Hampton
Represented By: Felicia Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson Eames
Represented By: Andrew J. Campanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?