T11 Funding v. Plaza Gate LLC et al
Plaintiff: T11 Funding
Defendant: New Stanton Cleaners, Inc., Nassau County Treasurer, New York State Department of Taxation and Finance, Harold WM Harrison, Frontpage Investments, Plaza Gate LLC, Incorporated Village of Great Neck Plaza, The Unknown Heirs, Legatees, Devisees, Distributees and/or Representatives of the Estate of Lillian Wiesner, United States of America, The Unknown Heirs, Legatees, Devisees, Distributees and/or Representatives of the Estate of Grace E. Stanton, United States Environmental Protection Agency, John Does and Jane Does, New York State Department of Environmental Conservation, Executeam, Corp. and Stanton Cleaners, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06261
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Pamela K Chen
Referring Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Adjourn Conference by T11 Funding. (Finley, Glenn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Letter Request Confernece by T11 Funding (Finley, Glenn)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to respond to Defendants' #7 request for a pre-motion conference within the time-frame set forth by Rule 3(A) of this Court's Individual Rules. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to do so to January 3, 2020. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/27/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for pre motion conference re #1 Notice of Removal, in Anticipation of Filing a Motion to Dismiss by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Mailloux, Matthew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: The instant action will not be related or consolidated with United States of America v. Estate of Wiesner, et al., 05-CV-1634 (DRH) (AKT). Accordingly, the Court denies the Federal Defendants' #3 request to reassign the instant action to Judge Hurley. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/20/2019. (Brodziak, Maya)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 12/16/2019. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 1/8/2020 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 1/6/2020. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 11/14/2019. (Quinlan, Krista)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America. (Mailloux, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mailloux on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Mailloux, Matthew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Related Case - United States of America v. Estate of Wiesner, et al., Civ. No. 05-1634 (Hurley, J.) (Tomlinson, M.J.) (Mailloux, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Environmental Protection Agency, United States of America from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Nassau County, case number 613615/2019. Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T11 Funding v. Plaza Gate LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Stanton Cleaners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Taxation and Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold WM Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontpage Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Gate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Incorporated Village of Great Neck Plaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs, Legatees, Devisees, Distributees and/or Representatives of the Estate of Lillian Wiesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Mailloux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs, Legatees, Devisees, Distributees and/or Representatives of the Estate of Grace E. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Matthew Mailloux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Environmental Conservation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executeam, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Cleaners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T11 Funding
Represented By: Glenn Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?