Farber v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Leonard P. Farber
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv06467
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Robert M Levy
Referring Judge: Eric N Vitaliano
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for pre motion conference , RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Leonard P. Farber. (Gisonni, Eve-Lynn)
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Paul Del Mauro on behalf of The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Del Mauro, Steven)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for pre motion conference by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (DiGiaimo, Louis)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 Letter by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (DiGiaimo, Louis)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DiGiaimo, Louis)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leonard P. Farber. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Gisonni, Eve-Lynn)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Philip DiGiaimo on behalf of The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (DiGiaimo, Louis)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Leonard P. Farber (Gisonni, Eve-Lynn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Leonard P. Farber (Gisonni, Eve-Lynn)
November 18, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please submit a Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen)
November 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Vanderbilt, Evelyn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12068701 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Leonard P. Farber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A Policy) (Gisonni, Eve-Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farber v. The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Paul Del Mauro
Represented By: Louis Philip DiGiaimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard P. Farber
Represented By: Eve-Lynn Gisonni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?