Butler v. Suffolk County et al
Plaintiff: Keith Terrell Butler
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe, Edwards, Lt. John Doe, Suffolk County, John Doe, CO #1688, Justin Francis, C. Crew, CO #1491, Errol D Toulon, Joseph A. Hanshe, Suffolk County Sheriff Department, Alex and James L. Tomarken
Case Number: 2:2019cv06754
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lois Bloom
Referring Judge: Brian M Cogan
2 Judge: William F Kuntz
3 Judge: Vera M Scanlon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Justin Francis, Correctional Officer. (Courtesy copies of the Court's Order, Summons and Plaintiff's Complaint sent to Suffolk County Attorney Executive, Steven Bellone - via regular mail) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Accordingly, the Complaint is sua sponte dismissed against Suffolk County, Suffolk County Sheriffs Office, Sheriff Errol Toulon, James L. Tomarken, Commissioner of Suffolk County Department of Health Services and Joseph A. Hanshe for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), 1915A(b)(l). The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to amend the caption to reflect their dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants, including the unidentified individual Defendants shall proceed and the Court ORDERS service of the Summons and Complaint upon these Defendants by the USMS. The Clerk of the Court is further ORDERED to serve a copy of the Complaint together with this Order on the Suffolk County Attorney and the Suffolk County Attorney's Office is requested to attempt to ascertain the full names of the unidentified Suffolk County Corrections Officers who are described in the Complaint and to provide the names and address(es) where these Defendants can be served to the Court and to Plaintiff within thirty (30) days of the date that this Order is served upon it. Once the information is provided to the Court by the Suffolk County Attorney's Office, Plaintiff's Complaint shall be deemed amended to reflect the full name of the unnamed Defendants, an amended Summons shall be issued as to these Defendants, and the United States Marshals Service shall serve them. Plaintiff's request for the appointment of pro bono counsel is denied without prejudice. The case is referred to the Honorable Lois Bloom, United States Magistrate Judge, for pretrial supervision. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is DENIED for the purpose of any appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 1/14/2020. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Parties: Suffolk County; Suffolk County Sheriff Department; James L. Tomarken, Commissioner of Health Services; Errol D Toulon, Suffolk County Correctional Facility; and Joseph A. Hanshe, Attorney at Law - terminated.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER denying [] Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/18/2019. (Kuntz, William)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting [] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on 12/18/2019. (Kuntz, William)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon for all further proceedings. Judge Brian M. Cogan, Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/16/2019. (Davis, Kimberly)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Letter dated 12/9/2019 to the United States District Court from Sergeant Greg Lambert re: Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Sergeant Greg Lambert writes to inform the Court that Keith Butler has been discharged from the Suffolk County Correctional Facility. (Tavarez, Jennifer)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Letter dated November 26, 2019 "requesting appointment of an attorney and declining the settlement," filed by pro-se, plaintiff Keith Butler. (Love, Alexis)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated 12/2/19 to Warden or Superintending regarding plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months as to Keith Terrell Butler. (Guzzi, Roseann)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Cox, Dwayne)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-10868. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Order, to Keith Terrell Butler DIN No. 19A0179 Marcy Correctional Facility P.O. Box 3600 Marcy, NY 13403-3600. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 11/25/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 25, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis see document #1 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Keith Terrell Butler. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 20, 2019 MOTION to Appoint Counsel see document #4 Application to Appoint Counsel by Keith Terrell Butler. (Cox, Dwayne)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Appoint Counsel pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006(A)(g) (Habeas Corpus Petition). Document filed by Keith Terrell Butler. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Keith Terrell Butler. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Alex, CO #1491, CO #1688, C. Crew, John Doe(#1), John Doe(#7), John Doe(#8), John Doe(#6), John Doe(#3), John Doe(#2), John Doe(#4), John Doe(#5), John Doe(Area Sgt.), John Doe, Edwards, Justin Francis, Joseph A. Hanshe, Suffolk County, Suffolk County Sheriff Department, James L. Tomarken, Errol D. Toulon. Document filed by Keith Terrell Butler. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Keith Terrell Butler. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]
November 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Suffolk County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO #1688
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Crew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO #1491
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Errol D Toulon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Hanshe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suffolk County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Tomarken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Terrell Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?