Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc. v. Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Plaintiff: Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv06856
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Joan M Azrack
Referring Judge: Arlene R Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's motion shall be served on or before February 19, 2020; Plaintiff's opposition to the motion shall be served on or before March 17, 2020; Defendant's reply shall be served on or before April 1, 2020. Moving party is responsible for filing the fully briefed motion on ECF and providing courtesy copies to Chambers. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/23/2020. (Simmons, James)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 Letter re parties proposed motion schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc. (Heller, Alan)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan M. Azrack: CIVIL CAUSE FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (Tel). For Plaintiff: Alan Heller. Counsel For Defendants: Bruce Gorman. Pre Motion Conference held on 1/23/2020 at 10:30 AM. Parties to submit a proposed motion schedule by close of business on 1/24/2020. The motion will be referred to Magistrate Judge Lindsay. The parties are reminded they may consent to Judge Lindsay for a decision on the motion or for all purposes. (Ortiz, Grisel)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The pre-motion conference scheduled for 1/21/2020 is ADJOURNED to 1/23/2020 at 10:30 AM and will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call and contact Chambers at 631-712-5600 when both parties are on the line. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/15/2020. (Posillico, Lauren)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Lenovo (United States), Inc.. (Gorman, Bruce)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. A pre-motion conference is scheduled for 3:45 PM on 1/21/2020 in Courtroom 6E North of the Brooklyn Courthouse, located at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201, before Judge Joan M. Azrack. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/13/2020. (Simmons, James)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for pre motion conference to grant Lenovo leave to file a motion to dismiss filed by Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc.. (Heller, Alan)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendant's letter #5 by January 7, 2020. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 12/26/2019. (Simmons, James)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply requesting extension of time to January 7, 2020 to respond to Lenovo's Pre-Motion Letter requesting to file a Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 5] by Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc. (Heller, Alan) Modified event type from Letter to Motion on 12/20/2019 (Ortiz, Grisel).
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for pre motion conference to grant Lenovo leave to file a motion to dismiss by Lenovo (United States), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Lenovo Limited Warranty) (Gorman, Bruce)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lenovo (United States), Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lenovo Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Lenovo Group Limited for Lenovo (United States), Inc.. (Gorman, Bruce)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 6, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Davis, Kimberly) Modified on 12/6/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lenovo (United States), Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, Case Number 615240/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-12128296). Was the Disclosure Statement on the Civil Cover Sheet completed - No. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (Gorman, Bruce) Modified on 12/6/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc. v. Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Represented By: Christian Andrew Stueben
Represented By: Bruce Michael Gorman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corporate Leasing Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Alan A. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?