Gjonbalaj v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et. al.
Plaintiff: Sokol Gjonbalaj
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Volkswagen AG
Case Number: 2:2019cv07165
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brian M Cogan
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Viceas to Brittany A. Boswell. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/24/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
January 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Brittany A. Boswell Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12293475. by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Boswell, Brittany)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jay Barnes. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2020 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jay Barnes Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12282480. by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Barnes, Jason)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #8 Letter Request for Extension of Time. Request granted, defendant's time to file its answer is extended to 3/15/2020. The Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 3/18/2020 at 5:00 pm in Chambers 704S and the parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference set forth at #6 . In addition, counsel is advised that since this letter seeks relief from the Court, it should have been designated as an ECF event Letter "Motion". Do not refile the letter. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/17/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 Letter Request for Extension of Time by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Carr, Brian)
January 16, 2020 Set/Reset Hearing Time: Initial Status Conference previously set at 11:30 am on 2/11/2020 is reset to 12:30 PM in Chambers 704S. (Weisberg, Peggy)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thien An Vinh Truong on behalf of Sokol Gjonbalaj (aty to be noticed) (Truong, Thien An)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 2/11/2020 at 11:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Volkswagen AG, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Volkswagen AG) (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Bowens, Priscilla) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Flanagan, Doreen). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Additional Quality Control Check Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen).
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Sokol Gjonbalaj (Breit, Mitchell)
December 23, 2019 Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM - please answer all questions). Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12183583 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Sokol Gjonbalaj. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons) (Breit, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gjonbalaj v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sokol Gjonbalaj
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Jason Barnes
Represented By: Thien An Vinh Truong
Represented By: Brittany Boswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?